US HCR48 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that August 30, 2021, be observed as the 131st anniversary of the 1890 Institutions.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that August 30, 2021, be observed as the 131st anniversary of the 1890 Institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2021-08-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-08-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E929) |
2021-08-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR103 (Same As) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/48/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hconres48/BILLS-117hconres48ih.pdf |