US HCR67 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of the Capitol grounds for the 26th Annual District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run on September 30, 2011.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-07 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree (Y: 379 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-09-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5464) |
2011-09-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-09-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 692). (text: CR H5943) |
2011-09-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5947) |
2011-09-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-09-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 67. |
2011-09-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5942-5943) |
2011-09-07 | House | Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2011-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR47 (Related) 2011-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HCR118 (Related) 2012-05-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR118 (Related) 2012-05-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.