US HJR70 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the week of February 7, 2022, through February 11, 2022, as "National School Counseling Week".
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of February 7, 2022, through February 11, 2022, as "National School Counseling Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR22 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR90 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1032)
SR516 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S712)
SR90 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1032)
SR516 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S712)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-joint-resolution/70/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hjres70/BILLS-117hjres70ih.pdf |