US HR1052 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of a National Move Over Law Day.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of a National Move Over Law Day.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-04-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR734 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S3865)
HR1463 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, H. Res. 1463 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8504; text: CR H8504-8505)
HR1463 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, H. Res. 1463 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8504; text: CR H8504-8505)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1052/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1052/BILLS-117hres1052ih.pdf |