US HR173 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the week beginning February 28, 2021, as "National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week".
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week beginning February 28, 2021, as "National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR94 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1034)
SR545 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1155; text: CR S1155)
HR983 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR545 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1155; text: CR S1155)
HR983 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/173/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres173/BILLS-117hres173ih.pdf |