US HR189 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 650) to amend the Truth in Lending Act to modify the definitions of a mortgage originator and a high-cost mortgage, providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 685) to amend the Truth in Lending Act to improve upon the definitions provided for points and fees in connection with a mortgage transaction, and providing for the adoption of the concurrent resolution (S. Con. Res. 11) setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2016 and setting forth the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2017 through 2025. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 650) to amend the Truth in Lending Act to modify the definitions of a mortgage originator and a high-cost mortgage, providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 685) to amend the Truth in Lending Act to improve upon the definitions provided for points and fees in connection with a mortgage transaction, and providing for the adoption of the concurrent resolution (S. Con. Res. 11) setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2016 and setting forth the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2017 through 2025.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 650) to amend the Truth in Lending Act to modify the definitions of a mortgage originator and a high-cost mortgage, providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 685) to amend the Truth in Lending Act to improve upon the definitions provided for points and fees in connection with a mortgage transaction, and providing for the adoption of the concurrent resolution (S. Con. Res. 11) setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2016 and setting forth the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2017 through 2025.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 237 N: 185 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 239 N: 183 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 239 N: 183 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-14 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 237 - 185 (Roll no. 149). (text: CR H2165-2166) |
2015-04-14 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 239 - 183 (Roll no. 148). (consideration: CR H2169-2170) |
2015-04-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 189. |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2165-2171) |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 19. |
2015-04-13 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of 3 measures: H.R. 650; H.R. 685; and S. Con. Res. 11. |
2015-04-13 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-65, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HR650 (Related) 2016-05-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
HB650 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB685 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SCR11 (Related) 2015-05-06 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB650 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB685 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SCR11 (Related) 2015-05-06 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.