US HR317 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes: (1) the region from Manhattan, Kansas, to Columbia, Missouri, including the metropolitan Kansas City area and St. Joseph, Missouri, as the Kansas City Animal Health Corridor; and (2) the Kansas City Animal Health Corridor as the national center of the animal health industry.
Title
Recognizing the region from Manhattan, Kansas, to Columbia, Missouri, as the Kansas City Animal Health Corridor, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Rep. Ike Skelton [D-MO] | Rep. Todd Tiahrt [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-15 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 312 - 108, 1 Present (Roll no. 700). (text: CR H9509-9510) | |
2009-09-15 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Dingell objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-09-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 317. | |
2009-09-15 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9509-9513, H9534-9535) | |
2009-09-15 | Mr. Holden moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-04-28 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture and Organic Agriculture. | |
2009-04-28 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry. | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SR174 (Same As) 2009-06-09 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6385-6386)
Subjects
Animals
Kansas
Livestock
Medical research
Missouri
Nutrition and diet
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Kansas
Livestock
Medical research
Missouri
Nutrition and diet
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases