US HR345 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-15 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-15 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns threats to freedom of the press around the world. It also remembers the bravery of journalists and media workers around the world and those who have died carrying out their work. It calls on the President and the Department of State to build upon U.S. leadership on press freedom issues.
Title
Recognizing widening threats to freedoms of the press and expression around the world, reaffirming the centrality of a free and independent press to the health of democracy, and reaffirming freedom of the press as a priority of the United States in promoting democracy, human rights, and good governance in commemoration of World Press Freedom Day on May 3, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5794-5795) |
2019-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 345. |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5793-5796) |
2019-07-15 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR179 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2574-2575; text: CR S2573-2574)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Violent crime
Worker safety and health
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Violent crime
Worker safety and health