US HR351 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 687) to facilitate the efficient extraction of mineral resources in southeast Arizona by authorizing and directing an exchange of Federal and non-Federal land, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1526) to restore employment and educational opportunities in, and improve the economic stability of, counties containing National Forest System land, while also reducing Forest Service management costs, by ensuring that such counties have a dependable source of revenue from National Forest System land, to provide a temporary extension of the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3102) to amend the Food and Nutrition Act 2008.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 687) to facilitate the efficient extraction of mineral resources in southeast Arizona by authorizing and directing an exchange of Federal and non-Federal land, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1526) to restore employment and educational opportunities in, and improve the economic stability of, counties containing National Forest System land, while also reducing Forest Service management costs, by ensuring that such counties have a dependable source of revenue from National Forest System land, to provide a temporary extension of the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3102) to amend the Food and Nutrition Act 2008; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-19 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 193 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-09-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 193 (Roll no. 474). (text: CR H5669) |
2013-09-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5694) |
2013-09-19 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 351, the Chair put the question on adotion of the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays, and Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the resolution until later in the legislative day. |
2013-09-19 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H5684, H5694) |
2013-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 351. |
2013-09-19 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5669-5684) |
2013-09-18 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 54. |
2013-09-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 687, H.R. 1526 and H.R. 3102. Measures will be considered read. |
2013-09-18 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-215, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB687 (Related) 2013-09-26 - Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 687 as unfinished business.
HB1526 (Related) 2013-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3102 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB1526 (Related) 2013-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3102 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.