US HR373 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of June 2017 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month" and calling on Congress to address gun violence. Expresses support for the designation of June 2017 as National Gun Violence Awareness Month. Calls on Congress to enact the following legislation to address gun violence: H.B. 1475, the Gun Trafficking Prevention Act; H.B. 1478, the Gun Violence Research Act of 2017; H.B. 1612, the Gun Show Loophole Closing Act of 2017; and legislation to ban assault weapons and large capacity ammunition magazines.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of June 2017 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month" and calling on Congress to address gun violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1475 (Similar To) 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB1478 (Related) 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1612 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HR920 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB1478 (Related) 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1612 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HR920 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime
Appropriations
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/373/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres373/BILLS-115hres373ih.pdf |