US HR434 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-14)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of "ALS Awareness Month".
Title
Supports the designation of "ALS Awareness Month".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR255 (Related) 2021-05-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3931; text: CR S3933-3934)
SR635 (Related) 2022-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2516; text: CR S2522-2523)
SR635 (Related) 2022-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2516; text: CR S2522-2523)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres434/BILLS-117hres434ih.pdf |