US HR48 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for observing National Trafficking and Modern Slavery Prevention Month.
Title
Supporting the observation of "National Trafficking and Modern Slavery Prevention Month" during the period beginning on January 1, 2019, and ending on February 1, 2019, to raise awareness of, and opposition to, human trafficking and modern slavery.
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR486 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S642-643)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Human rights
Human trafficking
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Human rights
Human trafficking
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/48/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres48/BILLS-116hres48ih.pdf |