US HR522 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1886) to authorize democratic, economic, and social development assistance for Pakistan, to authorize security assistance for Pakistan, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2410) to authorize appropriations for the Department of State and the Peace Corps for fiscal years 2010 and 2011, to modernize the Foreign Service.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1886) to authorize democratic, economic, and social development assistance for Pakistan, to authorize security assistance for Pakistan, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2410) to authorize appropriations for the Department of State and the Peace Corps for fiscal years 2010 and 2011, to modernize the Foreign Service, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-10 | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 183 (Roll no. 317). (text: CR H6421) | |
2009-06-10 | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6428) | |
2009-06-10 | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on H. Res. 522. | |
2009-06-10 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 522. | |
2009-06-10 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H6421-6429) | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 67. | |
2009-06-09 | Resolution provides for consideration of both H.R. 1886, H.R. 2410. In each case, all points of order against consideration of the bills are waived except for clause 9 and 10 of rule XXI. General debate on each bill shall continue for not to exceed one hour, equally divided and controlled. The text of H.R. 1886, as passed by the House, shall be appended as new matter at the end of the engrossment of H.R. 2410. | |
2009-06-09 | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-143, by Mr. Hastings (FL). |
Same As/Similar To
HB1886 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Laid on the table.
HB2410 (Related) 2009-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2410 (Related) 2009-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.