US HR549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-1)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reaffirms the House of Representatives' commitment to media diversity and expresses its pledge to eliminate barriers to such diversity.
Title
Reaffirming the commitment to media diversity and pledging to work with media entities and diverse stakeholders to develop common ground solutions to eliminate barriers to media diversity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7066) |
2020-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 549. |
2020-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7066-7067) |
2020-12-09 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 100. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-624. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR306 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S5410)