US HR631 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the 75th anniversary of operations by Continental Airlines. Congratulates the employees of Continental Airlines for the numerous awards and accolades they have earned for the company over the years.
Title
Congratulating Continental Airlines on its 75th Anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
Rep. Chet Edwards [D-TX] | Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Steven LaTourette [R-OH] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D-TX] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8988-8989) | |
2009-07-29 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 631. | |
2009-07-29 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8988-8990) | |
2009-07-29 | Mr. Green, Gene moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-07-23 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection. | |
2009-07-22 | Rereferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. | |
2009-07-22 | Committee on Science and Technology discharged. | |
2009-07-22 | Mr. Gordon (TN) asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Science and Technology be discharged from public consideration of H.Res. 631 and that the resolution be referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics. | |
2009-07-10 | Referred to the House Committee on Science and Technology. |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Transportation employees