US HR879 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of November 20, 2023, through December 20, 2023, as "National Survivors of Homicide Victims Awareness Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of November 20, 2023, through December 20, 2023, as "National Survivors of Homicide Victims Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2023-11-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR465 (Related) 2023-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5550-5551)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/879/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres879/BILLS-118hres879ih.pdf |