US HR90 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Demanding that the Government of the People's Republic of China and the Communist Party of China immediately release Mark Swidan.
Title
Demanding that the Government of the People's Republic of China and the Chinese Communist Party immediately release Mark Swidan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended RC# 193 (Y: 418 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2023-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-04-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 193). |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-04-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 90. |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-04-25 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2023-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR23 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1588; text: 02/01/2023 CR S210)