US HR965 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calling for the immediate release of Ryan Corbett, a United States citizen, who was wrongfully detained by the Taliban on August 10, 2022, and condemning the wrongful detention of Americans by the Taliban.
Title
Calling for the immediate release of Ryan Corbett, a United States citizen, who was wrongfully detained by the Taliban on August 10, 2022, and condemning the wrongful detention of Americans by the Taliban.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR638 (Related) 2024-04-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2716; text: CR S2721-2722)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/965/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres965/BILLS-118hres965ih.pdf |