US SB1011 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 350,000 $1 silver coins, and 300,000 half-dollar clad coins to commemorate the centennial of the founding of Father Flanagan's Boys Town. Requires the design of the coins to be emblematic of the 100 years of Boys Town, one of the largest nonprofit child care agencies in the United States. Permits issuance of such coins only between January 1, 2017, and December 31, 2018.
Title
Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2866 (Same As) 2014-12-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Nebraska
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Nebraska
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1011/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1011/BILLS-113s1011is.pdf |