US SB1046 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Smart Building Acceleration Act Directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to: (1) conduct a survey of privately owned smart buildings throughout the nation, select at least one building each from an appropriate range of building sizes and types, and evaluate the costs and benefits of such buildings using the guidelines of the Federal Energy Management Program relating to whole-building evaluation, measurement, and verification; and (2) establish a program to establish one or more smart buildings under the jurisdiction of the General Services Administration and the Departments of Defense, Energy, and Veterans Affairs to demonstrate and evaluate the costs and benefits of smart buildings. Requires such evaluations to include an identification of which advanced building technologies are most cost-effective and show the most promise for increasing building energy savings, increasing service performance to building occupants, and reducing environmental impacts. Defines a "smart building" to mean a building with an energy system that: is flexible and automated; has extensive operational monitoring and communication connectivity, allowing remote monitoring and analysis of all building functions; is integrated with the overall building operations for control of energy generation, consumption, and storage; and communicates with utilities and other third party commercial entities. Directs DOE: (1) as part of DOE's Better Building Challenge, to develop a smart building accelerator in consultation with major private sector property owners to demonstrate innovative policies and approaches that will accelerate the transition to smart buildings; and (2) to conduct research and development to address key barriers to the integration of advanced building technologies and to accelerate the transition to smart buildings.
Title
Smart Building Acceleration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2564 (Same As) 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
Building construction
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Veterans Affairs
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Veterans Affairs
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1046/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1046/BILLS-114s1046is.pdf |