US SB112 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act - Designates certain land in the Mount Baker-Snoqualmie National Forest in the state of Washington, which shall be considered to become a part of the Alpine Lakes Wilderness, as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Makes any land or interests within the proposed boundary acquired by the United States part of the Wilderness. Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate the Middle Fork Snoqualmie and Pratt Rivers in Washington as scenic and/or wild rivers.
Title
Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-06-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4718-4719) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 48. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-17. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB361 (Same As) 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats