US SB1146 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend part E of title IV of the Social Security Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to identify obstacles to identifying and responding to reports of children missing from foster care and other vulnerable foster youth, to provide technical assistance relating to the removal of such obstacles, and for other purposes.
Title
Find and Protect Foster Youth Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-11-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-10-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5232; text: CR S5232-5233) |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2426 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315.