US SB1152 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers administrative jurisdiction from the Department of the Interior to the Department of the Army over the 16.09-acre parcel of federal land in Arlington, Virginia, adjacent to and comprising Memorial Avenue from the western side of the Route 110 overpass, west to and including the hemicycle used by the Women in Military Service for America Memorial. Such land shall be administered as part of Arlington National Cemetery. The bill also transfers administrative jurisdiction from Army to Interior over the 1.04-acre parcel of federal land in Arlington adjacent to the Chaffee parking lot, comprising one structure, and bounded on the northeast by Sherman Drive. Such land shall be included within the boundary of Arlington House and the Robert E. Lee Memorial, and administered by Interior as part of such memorial. The land transfers of this bill shall be made without reimbursement nor consideration. The use of a bicycle trail or recreational access in the transferred lands may continue after transfer.
Title
A bill to provide for the transfer of administrative jurisdiction over certain parcels of Federal land in Arlington, Virginia, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Virginia
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1152/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1152/BILLS-116s1152is.pdf |