US SB1189 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a pilot grant program to improve recycling accessibility, and for other purposes.
Title
Recycling Infrastructure and Accessibility Act of 2024
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-03-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2368) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.1691 Amendment SA 1691 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Capito. (consideration: CR S2368) To improve the bill. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.1691 Amendment SA 1691 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2368) |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 104. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 118-41. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6159 (Same As) 2023-11-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5674)