US SB1277 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to modify the boundary of the Mammoth Cave National Park in the State of Kentucky, and for other purposes.
Title
Mammoth Cave National Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278. |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 118-134. |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text: CR S1348) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3007 (Related) 2023-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.