US SB1289 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-19 - Became Public Law No: 111-79.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-19 - Became Public Law No: 111-79.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Foreign Evidence Request Efficiency Act of 2009 - Amends the federal criminal code to: (1) allow any court of competent jurisdiction, as defined by this Act, to require the disclosure of stored wire or electronic communications for criminal investigations (currently, only a court with jurisdiction over the offense under investigation may issue an order for disclosure); and (2) authorize a federal judge to issue orders to execute requests from foreign judicial or law enforcement authorities for assistance in the investigation or prosecution of criminal offenses.
Title
Foreign Evidence Request Efficiency Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-19 | Became Public Law No: 111-79. | |
2009-10-19 | Signed by President. | |
2009-10-07 | Presented to President. | |
2009-09-30 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-09-30 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-30 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10092-10093) | |
2009-09-30 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1289. | |
2009-09-30 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10092-10094) | |
2009-09-30 | Mr. Schiff moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-08-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-07-10 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2009-07-10 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-07-10 | Received in the House. | |
2009-07-10 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7373-7374) | |
2009-07-10 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7373-7374) | |
2009-06-18 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2009-06-18 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6809-6810) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3133 (Same As) 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation