US SB1303 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 667.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 667.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to ensure that certain Federal infrastructure programs require the use of materials produced in the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Build America, Buy America Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 667. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-268. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
HB5059 (Related) 2021-08-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB5059 (Related) 2021-08-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.