US SB1308 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act to extend the deadline for the Secretary of the Interior to promulgate regulations implementing title IV of that Act, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act to extend the deadline for the Secretary of the Interior to promulgate regulations implementing title IV of that Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-07-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-07-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3120; text CR S3120) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-38. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5860 (Related) 2023-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.