US SB1425 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enable the Federal Trade Commission to deter filing of sham citizen petitions to cover an attempt to interfere with approval of a competing generic drug or biosimilar, to foster competition, and facilitate the efficient review of petitions filed in good faith to raise legitimate public health concerns, and for other purposes.
Title
Stop STALLING Act Stop Significant and Time-wasting Abuse Limiting Legitimate Innovation of New Generics Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179. |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin without amendment. Without written report. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2883 (Related) 2021-09-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 9.