US SB1447 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 219.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 219.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2017 This bill amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to reauthorize through FY2022 a diesel emissions reduction program. The program authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide grants, rebates, or loans for reducing diesel emissions from certain diesel vehicles or fleets by retrofitting or replacing their engines. The bill modifies requirements governing how the EPA must prioritize projects when providing grants, rebates, and loans. Specifically, the EPA must recognize differences in how vehicles, engines, equipment, and fleets are used across the country as it prioritizes projects that include certified engine configurations, verified technologies, or emerging technologies that have a long expected useful life. Under current law, the EPA must use a certain percentage of the funds made available for the program to support state administered programs for reducing diesel emissions. If a state does not quality for funds, then the funds for the unqualified state must be reallocated to qualified states. This bill requires the funds for the unqualified state to be reallocated to the national diesel emissions reduction program.
Title
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-21 | Senate | Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 219. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Senate vitiated previous passage. (consideration: CR S8280) |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8269-8270; text: CR S8270) |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 219. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 115-155. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3107 (Related) 2017-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Subjects
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles