US SB1491 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007, with respect to United States-Israel energy cooperation, to authorize the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to make grants to eligible applicants, including projects involving joint ventures of the U.S. and Israeli governments, to promote: (1) natural gas energy, including natural gas projects conducted by or in conjunction with the United States-Israel Binational Science Foundation; (2) improvement of energy efficiency and the overall performance of water technologies through research and development in water desalination, wastewater treatment and reclamation, and other water treatment refiners; and (3) conventional and unconventional oil and gas technologies. Authorizes the Secretary to enter into cooperative agreements supporting and enhancing dialogue and planning involving international partnerships between DOE, including its National Laboratories, and the government of Israel and its ministries, offices, and institutions. Limits the federal share of costs under such agreements to 50%. Authorizes the Secretary to establish a joint United States-Israel Center based in an area of the United States with the experience, knowledge, and expertise in offshore energy development to further collaboration to develop more robust academic cooperation in energy innovation technology and engineering, water science, technology transfer, and analysis of geopolitical implications of new natural resource development and associated areas. Extends the grant program through FY2024.
Title
A bill to amend the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 to improve United States-Israel energy cooperation, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with amendments. Without written report. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6330) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6329-6330) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3677 (Related) 2013-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3683 (Related) 2014-02-05 - Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-341, Part I.
HB3683 (Related) 2014-02-05 - Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-341, Part I.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Alternative and renewable resources
Computer security and identity theft
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Middle East
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Water quality
Water use and supply
Alternative and renewable resources
Computer security and identity theft
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Middle East
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Water quality
Water use and supply