US SB1510 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend provisions relating to the Office of the Inspector General of the Government Accountability Office, and for other purposes.
Title
GAO Inspector General Parity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-11-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-11-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1369 Amendment SA 1369 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1369 Amendment SA 1369 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Braun. (consideration: CR S5558) In the nature of a substitute. |
2023-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5558) |
2023-11-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5558) |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 191. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/27/2023 without amendment. With written report No. 118-88. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5300 (Same As) 2023-08-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.