US SB1521 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3886-3887)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3886-3887)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student Loan Relief Act of 2017
Title
Student Loan Relief Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3886-3887) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2477 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1162 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3015)
HB3390 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB4001 (Related) 2017-10-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1162 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3015)
HB3390 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB4001 (Related) 2017-10-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Education
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1521/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1521/BILLS-115s1521is.pdf |