US SB1528 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farm Dust Regulation Prevention Act of 2011 - Amends the Clean Air Act (CAA) to exempt nuisance dust from the CAA and excludes nuisance dust from references in the CAA to particulate matter, except with respect to geographic areas where such dust is not regulated under state, tribal, or local law to the extent the Administrator finds that: (1) nuisance dust (or any subcategory of nuisance dust) causes substantial adverse public health and welfare effects at ambient concentrations; and (2) the benefits of applying CAA standards and other requirements to such dust outweigh the costs. Defines "nuisance dust" as particulate matter: (1) generated from natural sources, unpaved roads, agricultural activities, earth moving, or other activities typically conducted in rural areas; or (2) consisting primarily of soil, other natural or biological materials, windblown dust, or some combination of such materials. Prohibits the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) from proposing, finalizing, implementing, or enforcing any regulation revising the national primary ambient air quality standard or the national secondary ambient air quality standard applicable to particulate matter with an aerodynamic diameter greater than 2.5 micrometers under the CAA for one year.
Title
Farm Dust Regulation Prevention Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Daniel Coats [R-IN] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] |
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2011-09-08 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5460-5461) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1633 (Related) 2011-12-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.
SB1720 (Related) 2011-10-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
SB1803 (Related) 2011-11-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2365 (Related) 2012-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1720 (Related) 2011-10-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
SB1803 (Related) 2011-11-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2365 (Related) 2012-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1528/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1528/BILLS-112s1528is.pdf |