US SB1595 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-25 - Became Public Law No: 115-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-25 - Became Public Law No: 115-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hizballah International Financing Prevention Amendments Act of 2018 This bill amends the Hizballah International Financing Prevention Act of 2015 to impose specified sanctions on: (1) foreign persons that knowingly assist in or provide support for fund raising or recruitment activities for Hizballah; (2) agencies of foreign governments that provide Hizballah with financial support, arms, or other assistance; and (3) Hizballah by reason of its narcotics trafficking and significant transnational criminal activities. The bill prescribes reporting requirements or reporting modifications with respect to: (1) foreign persons that knowingly assist or provide significant financial, material, or technological support for foreign persons assisting Hizballah; (2) financial institutions that are owned or organized under the laws of state sponsors of terrorism; (3) Hizballah's racketeering activities; (4) combating illicit tobacco trafficking networks used by Hizballah and other foreign terrorist organizations to finance their operations; (5) the estimated net worth of senior Hizballah officials and how their funds were acquired and used; and (6) revenue from Hizbollah's global logistics networks and legal measures available to target such networks.
Title
Hizballah International Financing Prevention Amendments Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-272. |
2018-10-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-10-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-10-12 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1595 by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | House | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6880) |
2018-09-28 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8872-8876) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1595. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8872-8878) |
2018-09-25 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-10-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375) |
2017-10-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.1110 Amendment SA 1110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.1110 Amendment SA 1110 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S6375) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3329 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Judicial review and appeals
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Organized crime
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Smuggling and trafficking
Terrorism
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Judicial review and appeals
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Organized crime
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Smuggling and trafficking
Terrorism
War and emergency powers