US SB1646 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
President Street Station Study Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the President Street Station, a railroad terminal in Baltimore, Maryland, to evaluate the terminal's national significance and determine its suitability and feasibility for designation as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
President Street Station Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510. |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-296. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Maryland
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
U.S. history
Historic sites and heritage areas
Maryland
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
U.S. history