US SB1779 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate copayments by the Department of Veterans Affairs for medicines relating to preventive health services, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Preventive Health Coverage Fairness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3452 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1779/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1779/BILLS-117s1779is.pdf |