US SB1792 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Investigations of Sex Offenders and Missing Children Act of 2011 - Amends the federal judicial code to authorize the United States Marshals Service to investigate, at the request of another federal, state, or local law enforcement agency, cases involving: (1) a sex offender who violates a sex offender registration requirement, or (2) a missing child.
Title
Strengthening Investigations of Sex Offenders and Missing Children Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2012-12-18 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8086-8087; text as passed: CR S8087) |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246. |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report. |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB671 (Related) 2011-12-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Sex offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Sex offenses