US SB1868 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require an interagency study to produce a security assessment process on adjacent space to high-security leased space to accommodate a Federal agency, and for other purposes.
Title
Secure Adjacent Federal Property Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-82. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.