US SB1935 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for an extension of the period of eligibility under the Department of Veterans Affairs training and rehabilitation program for veterans with service-connected disabilities by reason of school closures due to emergency and other situations, and for other purposes.
Title
VR&E NEED Act of 2021 Veteran Readiness and Employment National Emergency Extended Deadline Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2945 (Related) 2021-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2167 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1936 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB2167 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1936 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1935/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1935/BILLS-117s1935is.pdf |