US SB2043 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for certain authorities of the Department of State, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of State Authorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/27/2023 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1150 (Related) 2023-06-21 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 0.
SB1945 (Related) 2023-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5233 (Related) 2023-08-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB457 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB53 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S77-78)
SB2689 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2725 (Related) 2023-09-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5542 (Related) 2023-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB6181 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB6798 (Related) 2023-12-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB1945 (Related) 2023-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5233 (Related) 2023-08-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB457 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB53 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S77-78)
SB2689 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2725 (Related) 2023-09-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5542 (Related) 2023-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB6181 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB6798 (Related) 2023-12-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.