US SB2075 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Worker Health Care Tax Relief Act of 2015 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, the excise tax on employer-sponsored health care coverage for which there is an excess benefit (high-cost plans). The bill expresses the sense of the Senate that the revenue loss resulting from the repeal of such excise tax should be offset by corresponding revenue.
Title
American Worker Health Care Tax Relief Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2050 (Related) 2015-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2045 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR 6/9/2016 S3723)
SB2045 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR 6/9/2016 S3723)
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2075/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2075/BILLS-114s2075is.pdf |