US SB2089 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 117-158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 117-158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that grants provided by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for State veterans' cemeteries do not restrict States from authorizing the interment of certain deceased members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces in such cemeteries, and for other purposes.
Title
Keep Kids Fed Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 376 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-25 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-158. |
2022-06-25 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-06-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-24 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5892-5893) |
2022-06-24 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-06-24 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1204, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment to S. 2089. |
2022-06-24 | House | Mr. Scott (VA) moved that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment. (consideration: CR H5892-5895) |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-06-24 | House | Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to by voice vote. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-06-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 42 (Roll no. 290). (text: CR H5837) |
2022-06-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5853-5854) |
2022-06-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2089. |
2022-06-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5837-5840) |
2022-06-23 | House | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | S.Amdt.5133 Amendment SA 5133 proposed by Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S3137; text: CR S3137) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | S.Amdt.5133 Amendment SA 5133 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to the title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3137) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the title by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment to S.2089 with an amendment (SA 5133) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendment to S.2089 with an amendment (SA 5133) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3137) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill. |
2022-03-08 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-03-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1013; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1013) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 288. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3944 (Same As) 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 12.
HB8150 (Related) 2022-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
HB8150 (Related) 2022-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.