US SB2228 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the William M. (Mac) Thornberry National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021 to clarify the scope of a major Federal action under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 with respect to certain projects relating to the production of semiconductors, and for other purposes.
Title
Building Chips in America Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6010) |
2023-12-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1378 Amendment SA 1378 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Kelly. (consideration: CR S6010) In the nature of a substitute. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1378 Amendment SA 1378 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6009-6010) |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4549 (Same As) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.