US SB2396 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide enhanced protection against debt collector harassment of members of the Armed Forces.
Title
Fair Debt Collection Practices for Servicemembers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB5674 (Related) 2023-09-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB5674 (Related) 2023-09-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/2396/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s2396/BILLS-118s2396is.pdf |