US SB2442 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the use of passenger facility charges at an airport previously associated with the airport at which the charges are collected. This bill permits the Department of Transportation to authorize the use of a passenger facility charge to finance an eligible airport-related project if: (1) the eligible agency seeking to impose the new charge controls an airport where a $2 passenger facility charge became effective on January 1, 2013; and (2) such airport and the airport at which the project will be carried out were under the control of the same eligible agency on October 1, 2015. Not more than $120 million in passenger facility charges so collected may be used to carry out such a project.
Title
A bill to authorize the use of passenger facility charges at an airport previously associated with the airport at which the charges are collected.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4369 (Same As) 2016-07-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2442/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2442/BILLS-114s2442is.pdf |