US SB2510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reduce the health risks of heat by establishing the National Integrated Heat Health Information System Program within the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the National Integrated Heat Health Information System Interagency Committee to improve extreme heat preparedness, planning, and response, requiring a study, and establishing financial assistance programs to address heat effects, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing HEAT Illness and Deaths Act of 2021 Preventing Health Emergencies And Temperature-related Illness and Deaths Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624. |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5296 (Related) 2022-12-01 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Ms. Bonamici asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be considered to be the first sponsor of H.R. 5296, as bill originally introduced by Representative Crist of Florida, for the purposes of adding cosponsors and requesting re-printings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.