US SB2560 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reclamation Title Transfer Act of 2018
Title
Reclamation Title Transfer Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 681. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-395. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government buildings, facilities, and property
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Government buildings, facilities, and property
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply