US SB27 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hill Creek Cultural Preservation and Energy Development Act - Authorizes Utah to relinquish for the benefit of the Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation certain of its school trust or subsurface mineral lands south of the border between Grand County and Uintah County, Utah, in exchange for certain federal subsurface mineral lands north of that border. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to reserve an overriding interest in that portion of the mineral estate composed of minerals subject to leasing under the Mineral Leasing Act in the mineral lands conveyed to Utah. Delineates the extent of that interest. Requires Utah to reserve, for the benefit of its school trust, an overriding interest in that portion of the mineral estate composed of minerals subject to leasing under the Mineral Leasing Act in the mineral lands it relinquished to the federal government. Delineates the extent of that interest.
Title
Hill Creek Cultural Preservation and Energy Development Act
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-49. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-28. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB356 (Same As) 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-133.