US SB273 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the management of driftnet fishing.
Title
Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-09-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S6481) |
2021-09-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.3827 Amendment SA 3827 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S6481; text: CR S6481) To amend the fees provision. |
2021-09-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.3827 Amendment SA 3827 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6480-6481) |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S574-575) |
Same As/Similar To
HB404 (Related) 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 402.